California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2023

Amended

Bill July 8, 2024
Bill June 5, 2024
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023