|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2595.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2495.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Set for hearing September 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2384.) Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2931.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 711.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|