California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill August 31, 2023
Bill August 14, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023