Senate
|
09/29/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5727.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6889.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 and 69 suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2024
|
Action rescinded whereby bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6378.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1166.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 340.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|