California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 6, 2023
Bill June 30, 2023
Bill June 26, 2023