|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 3155.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 801.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|