California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023