Senate | 11/29/2023 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | April 26 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 934.) | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | March 29 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 570.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |