|
09/30/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2795.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2770.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2683.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3290.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 831.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|