California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB35 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill August 28, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023