Senate
|
09/28/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5296.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 6276.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Davies.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Davies.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1167.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 892.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|