|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2464.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2966.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1295.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 637.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|