California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB38 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill August 31, 2023
Bill July 3, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023