|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2632.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2930.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 1359.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1168.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 899.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|