LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB389
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB389
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB389
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 9, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 14, 2023
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 8, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 31, 2023
Compare
Bill
July 6, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 27, 2023
Compare