Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2675.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 3157.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1170.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 790.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 712.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|