California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB433 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Amended

Bill September 6, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023