California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB455 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023