|
09/30/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 287, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2240.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1214.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|