California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill June 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023