|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2740.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 14. Page 3248.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 790.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|