California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill June 30, 2023
Bill June 8, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023