|
09/30/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 288, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1300.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1173.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 903.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 637.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|