California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB506 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023