|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 858, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 5631.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5622.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Set for hearing August 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 6506.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1393.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1174.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 792.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 683.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|