|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 716, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2678.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 3138.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3010.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 2829.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1215.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 659.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|