California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill August 28, 2023
Bill June 14, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023