California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB55 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill July 5, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023