|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5769.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 7003.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2024
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6319.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2958.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 2950.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Set for hearing January 9 in HOUSING pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Set for hearing January 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|