|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5296.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6319.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3019.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2969.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2022
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|