California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB56 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill June 10, 2024
Bill January 3, 2024