|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 862, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 3. Page 6661.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
June 4 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 2950.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Set for hearing January 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|