California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill January 4, 2024
Bill January 3, 2024
Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023