|
07/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2266.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1021.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|