California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB652 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023

Amended

Bill June 8, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023