|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2740.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 850.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 684.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|