California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023