|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3204.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1054.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 904.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|