California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023