Assembly | 09/01/2023 | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2023 | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1159.) (May 18). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 710.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |