|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 861, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2669.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1251.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1250.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Umberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|