California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB71 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill July 3, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023