|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 719, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2794.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3356.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3010.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1214.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 898.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|