California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023