|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5635.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 1. Page 6696.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|