California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB729 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill August 14, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023