Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2471.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2965.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1304.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
April 11 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|