California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB731 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023