|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 884, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2681.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 3206.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1220.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1182.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 797.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|