California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB745 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill June 13, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023